Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gábor Antal Erdődy

Deceased

Bishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1684³BornPresbourg
6 Jun 171227.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Eger, Hungary
19 Nov 171430.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Eger, Hungary
19 Nov 171430.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
13 Jan 171530.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
3 Mar 171530.4SucceededBishop of Eger, Hungary
26 Sep 174459.9DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gábor Antal Erdődy:
Bishop Gábor Antal Erdődy (born , died ) Bishop of Eger

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015