Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Máriási

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1689¹BornCassovia
8 Feb 173041.1AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1 Oct 173041.7Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
19 Apr 175566.2DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Máriási:
Bishop Alexander Máriási (born 1689, died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015