Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Dolny

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
15 Jun 169956.4SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
25 Jun 170360.4ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
29 Jul 170360.5Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
2 Jun 170764.4DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Dolny
Bishop István Dolny (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTardoskedd

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,703, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast