Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Bakich de Lach

Deceased

Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1670³BornSplit
17 Dec 169525.2Ordained PriestPriest
1710³39.2SelectedBishop of Srijem, Serbia
24 Apr 171645.5SelectedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
7 Dec 171646.1ConfirmedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
18 May 171746.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
5 Jul 174978.7DiedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petrus Bakich de Lach:
Bishop Petrus Bakich de Lach (born , died ) Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124, and Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015