Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Carafa della Spina, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aversa

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1611³BornRome
13 Jul 164433.2AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
27 Dec 164433.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
1 Feb 165341.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Oct 165443.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Nov 1654³43.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Aug 165847.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Sep 1658³47.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
14 Jan 166452.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Apr 166452.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
Dec 1664³53.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
6 Jun 166554.1ResignedBishop of Aversa, Italy
27 May 167564.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
19 Oct 168069.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Carlo Carafa della Spina (VIAF: 76306384)
Carlo Cardinal Carafa della Spina C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aversa

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 20
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016