Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Michele Cardinal Litta

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1608BornMilan
164839.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 165243.7AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 Jun 165243.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Jan 166455.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Feb 166657.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 May 166657.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
28 Aug 167970.9DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Michele Litta:
Cardinal Alfonso Michele Litta (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013