Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Roma

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1584BornMilan
11 Jan 162136.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 162136.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
17 Mar 162136.5AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
16 May 162136.6Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
21 Aug 163449.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
28 Mar 163954.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
13 Jul 164459.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
23 Oct 164561.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 Apr 165267.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
16 Sep 165268.0DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Roma:
Giulio Cardinal Roma (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
  • a cardinal for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 337, and Page 293
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 5 Mar 2015