Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giavanbattista Rainoldi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1645AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
13 Aug 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
25 Dec 1649DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giavanbattista Rainoldi
Bishop Giavanbattista Rainoldi (died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 670
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018