Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Onorato Visconti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornMilano
15 Apr 163045.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
10 Jun 163045.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
30 Jun 1630³45.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
12 Apr 163550.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1645¹60.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onorato Visconti (VIAF: 89524613)
Archbishop Onorato Visconti (born 1585, died 1645) Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016