Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Antonio Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635Born
27 May 167540.4AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
3 Jun 167540.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
24 Nov 168752.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Catania, Italy
26 Aug 169257.6DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Carafa
Archbishop Francesco Antonio Carafa C.R. (born 1635, died ) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150, and Page 235
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,482
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018