Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona

Archidioecesis Lancianensis-Ortonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Emidio Cipollone, Archbishop
  • Enzio d’Antonio, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Carlo Ghidelli, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lanciano
27 April 1515ErectedDiocese of Lanciano (erected)
Archdiocese of Lanciano
9 February 1562ElevatedDiocese of Lanciano Archdiocese of Lanciano
Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)
19 February 1834UnitedArchdiocese of Lanciano
Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli
Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)
Archdiocese of Lanciano e Ortona
24 November 1945Name ChangedArchdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona) Archdiocese of Lanciano e Ortona
Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Lanciano e Ortona Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lanciano e Ortona
1949190,925192,34499.3%12110022186315021437ap1951
196985,77185,85199.9%64361008575016336ap1971
198077,53077,91499.5%5235878914711540ap1981
Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona
199087,55588,02799.5%4228701,250359541ap1991
199989,52789,88499.6%4631771,1622379742ap2000
200089,33490,25499.0%3833711,25824110042ap2001
200189,74890,46899.2%3738751,1962419942ap2002
200289,90490,60499.2%3637731,2313409742ap2003
200390,05490,70499.3%3729661,3643319542ap2004
200490,20590,85599.3%3733701,2883369142ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 4 Dec 2013