Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Gervasoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1716Born
27 Oct 176953.1SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
20 Nov 176953.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
30 Nov 176953.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
Nov 1784³68.1DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Gervasoni
Archbishop Domenico Gervasoni (born , died Nov 1784) Archbishop of Lanciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrtona

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,769, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast