Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Angelo de Pace

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1669³BornLucera
5 Jun 169424.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 173868.8SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
26 Jan 173969.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
1 Feb 173969.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
7 Mar 174575.5DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Angelo de Pace:
Archbishop Domenico Angelo de Pace (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015