Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas François Bonhomme

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Carpasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1682BornLeodien
17 Dec 170725.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 172946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
27 Feb 172946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
29 Oct 176381.2DiedTitular Bishop of Carpasia

MicroData Summary for Nicolas François Bonhomme:
Bishop Nicolas François Bonhomme (died ) Titular Bishop of Carpasia

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014