Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Rudolf von Sporck

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1696Born
14 Jul 171923.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Jul 171923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Feb 172932.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
24 Feb 172932.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
5 Mar 173336.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 Jan 175962.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Rudolf von Sporck
Bishop Johann Rudolf von Sporck (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast