Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Joseph von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1694BornDeschna
27 Sep 171925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Jul 173339.4SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
18 Dec 173339.8ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
7 Mar 173440.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
11 Sep 175359.5DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Joseph von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz:
Bishop Johann Joseph von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015