Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Viterbo

Dioecesis Viterbiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lino Fumagalli, Bishop
  • Lorenzo Chiarinelli, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 February 1991
  • Metropolitan: Diocese of Roma {Rome}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 2,161 (834 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Lazio
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesiviterbo.it/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo Vescovile, Piazza S. Lorenzo 9/a, 01100 Viterbo, Italia
  • Telephone: 0761.34.17.16
  • Fax: 0761.30.60.06

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Viterbo
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Viterbo (erected)
Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
12th CenturyUnitedDiocese of Tuscanella
Diocese of Viterbo
Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
2 May 1936UnitedTerritorial Abbey of San Martino al Monte Cimino Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Diocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino
27 March 1986UnitedDiocese of Acquapendente
Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)
Diocese of Montefiascone
Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Diocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino
Diocese of Viterbo
16 February 1991Name ChangedDiocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino Diocese of Viterbo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
195073,40673,48099.9%664611265511539539ap1951
196973,78373,783100.0%635411763016742039ap1971
198083,95185,00098.8%50469687412633044ap1981
Diocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino
1990198,200198,60099.8%15072222892217254894ap1991
Diocese of Viterbo
1999162,400163,40099.4%11574189859412346196ap2000
2000162,400163,40099.4%12174195832710545596ap2001
2001162,400163,40099.4%11668184882711145596ap2002
2002180,053181,55399.2%12067187962710511096ap2003
2003180,053181,55399.2%1246218696877213896ap2004
2004181,689184,27898.6%112621741,044711711296ap2005
2010162,837168,00196.9%115671828941117412696ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Aug 2014