Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tiberio Cardinal Muti

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574BornRome
19 Dec 161138.0AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
15 Jan 161238.0Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
2 Dec 161541.9Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 161642.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
14 Apr 163662.3DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Muti:
Cardinal Tiberio Muti (died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 12, and Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 51, Number 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013