Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gavino Magliano

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1627AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
11 Apr 1627Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1641¹DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gavino Magliano
Archbishop Gavino Magliano (died 1641) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,627, Number 39
  • ob/c2: AT, 16 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast