Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Caffarelli-Borghese

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576²Born
18 Jul 160529.5Elevated to Cardinal
5 Aug 160529.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Aug 160529.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 160529.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
1607¹31.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
1607²31.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
11 Jun 160933.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
5 Jan 161034.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Oct 161034.8AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
8 Dec 161034.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
2 Apr 161236.2ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
16 Feb 161842.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
17 Feb 161842.1ResignedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
1620²44.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
20 Aug 162953.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
2 Oct 163357.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Scipione Caffarelli-Borghese (VIAF: 54156396)
Scipione Cardinal Caffarelli-Borghese (born 1576, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSant'Andrea a Montecavallo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Paoline Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Jul 1605
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 9, and Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 23
  • c1: AT, 1 Jan 2018
  • c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast