Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Sforza

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1562BornParma, Italy
12 Dec 158321.1Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jan 158421.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
29 Jul 158522.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
5 Dec 158826.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
161451.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 161755.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
5 Mar 161855.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
1 May 161855.5Ordained BishopBishop of Albano
6 Apr 162057.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
27 Sep 162360.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
9 Sep 162461.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sforza:
Cardinal Francesco Sforza (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 10.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 47
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 64, Number 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013