Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano de Rosis

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1624AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
11 Feb 1624Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
15 Aug 1624DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano de Rosis:
Bishop Stefano de Rosis (died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 83, Number 492
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015