Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fausto Caffarelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1595³BornAlessandro
7 Jan 162428.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jan 162428.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
12 Mar 162429.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Jul 163439.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
4 May 164146.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
17 Nov 165156.7DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fausto Caffarelli
Archbishop Fausto Caffarelli (born Mar 1595, died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 84, Number 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 17
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016