Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornNapoli
24 Aug 164860.6AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
20 Sep 164860.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
14 Feb 166476.1SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
23 Jun 166476.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
22 Feb 167587.1DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Carafa:
Archbishop Gregorio Carafa C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 138, and Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 680
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013