Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cosimo Cardinal de Torres

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584²BornRome
17 Mar 162137.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
25 Apr 162137.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
21 May 162137.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
5 Sep 162238.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 162238.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Mar 162339.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
22 May 162339.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
16 Sep 162440.7AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
1626²42.0ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
3 Apr 163450.2AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
1 Jul 164157.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1 May 164258.3DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosimo de Torres:
Cosimo Cardinal de Torres (died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
  • a cardinal for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Sep 1622
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 16, and Page 68
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 71, Number 416
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249, and Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015