Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulus Aldringen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornLuxemburg
28 Apr 162738.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Apr 162738.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
1 May 162738.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
28 Mar 164455.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulus Aldringen:
Bishop Paulus Aldringen (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 89, Number 528
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013