Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germanicus Mantica

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1620AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
28 Oct 1620Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
21 Feb 1633AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
Feb 1639³DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Germanicus Mantica:
Bishop Germanicus Mantica , Bishop of Adria

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 69, Number 403
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184, and Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015