Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Marini (Marinich), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1624AppointedBishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
18 Aug 1624Ordained BishopBishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
15 Jun 1641DiedBishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Elias Marini (Marinich):
Bishop Elias Marini (Marinich) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 319
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 86, Number 510
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015