Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bonfiglioli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carinola (Calina)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1622AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
25 Sep 1622Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
1624¹ResignedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
1 Nov 1624DiedBishop Emeritus of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bonfiglioli:
Bishop Antonio Bonfiglioli (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carinola (Calina)

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015