Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Attilio Amalteo

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²Born
14 Aug 160661.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
20 Aug 160661.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
1 Sep 160661.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
26 Apr 161065.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
25 May 163388.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Attilio Amalteo (VIAF: 17141685)
Archbishop Attilio Amalteo (born 1545, died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOderzo, Diocese of Ceneda, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 38
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 251
  • ob/c2: AT, 30 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast