Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Sanctatus, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rethymo, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹Born
27 Jan 161639.0AppointedBishop of Rethymo, Greece
31 Jan 161639.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rethymo, Greece
1617¹40.0DiedBishop of Rethymo, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Sanctatus
Bishop Giovanni Sanctatus O.P. (born 1577, died 1617) Bishop of Rethymo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovigo
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 295
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 46
  • b/c2+: CB, 22 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017