Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Galamini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553²BornBrisighella
1608²55.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Aug 161158.6Elevated to Cardinal
1612¹59.0ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Nov 161259.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
11 Feb 161360.1AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
12 Mar 161360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
29 Apr 162067.3AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
6 Sep 163986.6DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Galamini:
Agostino Cardinal Galamini O.P. (died ) Bishop of Osimo

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
  • a cardinal for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015