Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Verallo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornRoma
5 May 160640.3AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
28 May 160640.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
10 Jun 160640.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Jun 160842.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Nov 160842.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 160842.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
23 Mar 161549.2ResignedBishop of San Severo, Italy
17 Nov 162458.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Verallo (VIAF: 315976154)
Fabrizio Cardinal Verallo (born 1566, died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Nov 1608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016