Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino Piccoli

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
15 Dec 162141.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Strongoli, Italy
15 Dec 162141.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
2 Jan 162241.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
2 Oct 162746.8SucceededBishop of Strongoli, Italy
163655.0DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Piccoli:
Archbishop Bernardino Piccoli Bishop of Strongoli

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 257, and Page 323
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 74, Number 432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013