Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Muzio Cinquini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1609AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
15 Dec 1625ResignedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
10 Apr 1627DiedBishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Muzio Cinquini:
Bishop Muzio Cinquini (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013