Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli

Dioecesis Auximana et Cingulana

Split

To: Diocese of Osimo



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Osimo
7th CenturyErectedDiocese of Osimo (erected)
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
19 August 1725UnitedDiocese of Cingoli
Diocese of Osimo
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
20 March 1937Territory LostDiocese of Osimo e Cingoli (S. Maria ab Ulmo) Diocese of Jesi
15 August 1972Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Osimo e Cingoli (from Immediately Subject to Ancona e Numana)
19 March 1984Territory AddedArchdiocese of Camerino (S. Stefano in Villa S. Stefano, Ss. Salvatore in Valcarecce, S. Michele Arcangelo in Castello, S. Giorgio in Castreccioni, S. NicolÚ in Moscosi) Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
19 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of Osimo e Cingoli (Saints Giovanni Battista from Pietro Apostolo in Appignano) Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino
19 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of Osimo e Cingoli (S. Donato, S. Antonio a Osterianova) Diocese of Recanati
19 March 1984Territory AddedDiocese of Recanati (S. Stefano Protomartire, Ss. Annunziata in Crocette, S. Pietro Apostolo in S. Agostino, S. Antonio da Padova, along with San Rocco) Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
25 January 1985SplitDiocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Diocese of Recanati
Diocese of San Severino (-Treia)
Diocese of Macerata, Tolentino, Recanati, Cingoli, and Treia
25 January 1985SplitDiocese of Osimo e Cingoli Diocese of Osimo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
188653,124.0%199037OTC
194937,44537,445100.0%86381243014016539ap1951
196955,24755,272100.0%73411144844915739ap1971
198055,41355,54199.8%6135965774311939ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Osimo
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 120, and Page 121
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 100
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 125
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107, and Page 108
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 712, to Page 713
  • Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 713
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 664, and Page 665
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 76, Page 910, to Page 913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Oct 2023