Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Maria (Antonio) Ascensi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1750BornContigliano
6 Mar 177322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 May 182474.1AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
27 May 182474.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Apr 182777.0ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
21 May 182777.1AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
6 Dec 182878.7DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
15 Dec 182878.7Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Maria (Antonio) Ascensi:
Bishop Timoteo Maria (Antonio) Ascensi O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98, and Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013