Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Zen

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1772Born
21 Dec 180533.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 181643.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
29 Apr 181643.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
19 May 181643.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
27 Aug 181744.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1819²46.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
29 Jun 182552.6DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Zen (VIAF: 315976177)
Archbishop Carlo Zen (born , died ) Secretary of Bishops and Regulars

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,816, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 147
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 125, and Page 243, and Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast