Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arcangelo Gabriele Cela

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1770BornBisaccien
14 Jun 179423.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 181949.0SelectedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
17 Dec 181949.2ConfirmedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 Dec 181949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
25 Sep 182252.0DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Gabriele Cela:
Bishop Arcangelo Gabriele Cela (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013