Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Québec

Archidioecesis Quebecensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gérald Cyprien Lacroix, I.S.P.X., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Denis Grondin, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Gaétan Proulx, O.S.M., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Maurice Couture, R.S.V., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 January 1819
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 35,180 (13,588 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Q
  • Official Web Site: http://www.ecdq.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancellerie, 1073 Boul. René-Lévesque Ouest, Sillery, QC G1S 4R5, Canada
  • Telephone: (418)688-1211
  • Fax: 688-2960

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of New France (Nouvelle-France)
11 April 1658ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New France (Nouvelle-France) (erected)
Diocese of Québec
1 October 1674ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of New France (Nouvelle-France) Diocese of Québec
4 July 1817Territory LostDiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of Nova Scotia (erected)
12 January 1819Territory LostDiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Canada (erected)
Archdiocese of Québec
12 January 1819ElevatedDiocese of Québec Archdiocese of Québec
11 August 1829Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Charlottetown (erected)
13 May 1836Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Montréal (erected)
30 September 1842Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Saint John in America (erected)
16 April 1844Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Vicariate Apostolic of North-West (Nord-Ouest) (erected)
12 July 1844ElevatedArchdiocese of Québec (becomes a Metropolitan)
8 June 1852Territory LostDiocese of Montréal
Archdiocese of Québec
Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe (erected)
8 June 1852Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Trois Rivières (erected)
15 January 1867Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) (erected)
28 August 1874Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec
Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe
Diocese of Trois Rivières
Diocese of Sherbrooke (erected)
28 May 1878Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Chicoutimi (erected)
23 June 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Québec
1950622,000632,10098.4%1,1003511,4514283996,500285ap1951
1966710,421716,86499.1%1,0525131,5654531,3607,720275ap1967
1970761,728768,35199.1%1,0055761,5814811486,992272ap1971
1976873,165885,60198.6%9575601,517575261,4796,500276ap1977
1980954,359993,13896.1%8946141,508632351,3196,223274ap1981
19901,041,1161,063,40697.9%7044541,158899621,0454,657273ap1991
19991,042,7621,075,18897.0%5683499171,137797633,816254ap2000
20001,014,3611,047,00196.9%5503569061,119817783,812249ap2001
20011,027,9481,072,95095.8%5353618961,147827623,771234ap2002
20021,040,2271,080,13596.3%5183518691,197867473,766233ap2003
20031,047,4251,098,21295.4%5183428601,217937673,502229ap2004
20041,076,1801,149,30193.6%4983488461,272917343,282227ap2005
20101,040,6901,195,26187.1%4182837011,484956292,729219ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jun 2014