Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aeneas Bernard MacEachern

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1759BornKinlock-Moidart, Great Britain
16 Feb 178728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
12 Jan 181959.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
12 Jan 181959.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
17 Jun 182162.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
11 Aug 182970.5AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
22 Apr 183576.2DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Aeneas Bernard MacEachern:
Bishop Aeneas Bernard MacEachern (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 134, and Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013