Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Blois

Dioecesis Blesensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tours
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,422 (2,480 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholique-blois.net/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 2 rue Porte Clos Haut, 41000 Blois, France
  • Telephone: 2.54.56.40.60
  • Fax: 2.54.56.01.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Blois
1 July 1697ErectedDiocese of Blois (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Blois (suppressed) Diocese of Orléans
Diocese of Blois
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Orléans Diocese of Blois
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Blois (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Blois
1950169,693242,41970.0%2291224170410479295ap1951
1959227,832239,82495.0%213142271,00314403295ap1960
1970254,501267,89695.0%175201951,30513353298ap1971
1980270,000287,77993.8%133291621,666129285292ap1981
1990277,000306,00090.5%104171212,289519158292ap1991
1999245,000306,15080.0%99101092,247712130292ap2000
2000250,000314,31179.5%10681142,192710137292ap2001
2001250,000314,31179.5%10091092,293710140292ap2002
2002250,000314,31179.5%90141042,403719137292ap2003
2003250,000314,31179.5%85201052,380723112292ap2004
2004258,680317,81081.4%8311942,75119104292ap2005
2006258,073317,81081.2%8910992,606101497292ap2007
2012185,097338,50354.7%6431951,94883481293ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014