Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred-Jules Mélisson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Blois, France

Titular Archbishop of Viminacium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1842Born
15 Apr 186522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Le Mans, France
10 Oct 190765.0AppointedBishop of Blois, France
30 Nov 190765.1Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
9 Feb 192582.3RetiredBishop of Blois, France
9 Feb 192582.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
11 Jul 192582.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Viminacium
6 Jun 192784.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Jules Mélisson
Archbishop Alfred-Jules Mélisson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParigné-l`Évêque

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018