Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Rumeau

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1849Born
25 May 187223.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 189849.4SelectedBishop of Angers, France
28 Nov 189849.8ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
2 Feb 189950.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
27 Feb 189950.1InstalledBishop of Angers, France
9 Feb 194091.0DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rumeau (VIAF: 136388)
Bishop Joseph Rumeau (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTournon d'Agenais
Ordained BishopCathedral, Agen, Diocese of Agen
Death PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2/b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 54
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 9
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 549, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,089, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast