Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Frédéric Fallières

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1834Born
7 Sep 185622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Amiens, France
28 Aug 188955.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
30 Dec 188955.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
23 Feb 189055.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
11 May 190672.0DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Frédéric Fallières (VIAF: 41831526)
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Frédéric Fallières (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMézin, Diocese of Agen
Ordained BishopPons, Charente Maritime

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017