Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Agen

Dioecesis Agennensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 4th Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,384 (2,079 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-agen.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 5 rue Roger Johan, 47000 Agen, France
  • Telephone: 5.53.66.10.23
  • Fax: 5.53.47.14.88

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Agen (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Agen Diocese of Condom (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Auch (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Condom (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lescar (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Diocese of Bayonne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lectoure (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Tarbes (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Diocese of Bayonne
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Agen Archdiocese of Auch

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950210,000265,45079.1%26655321654109323440ap1951
195924,800265,6489.3%255503058193312439ap1960
1970240,000289,75582.8%2463928584243345134ap1971
1980247,000294,00084.0%182422241,102242245439ap1981
1990244,000301,00081.1%145562011,213867141439ap1991
1999245,000307,80379.6%105431481,6551152141435ap2000
2000242,000305,98879.1%101391401,7281050133425ap2001
2001242,000317,94576.1%94401341,8051750117442ap2002
2002248,000317,94578.0%101311321,8781340122404ap2003
2003246,000317,94577.4%90451351,822145698404ap2004
2004200,000317,94562.9%85361211,652144876365ap2005
2006201,700321,00062.8%81361171,723194987309ap2007
2012202,000337,50059.9%6127882,295213967194ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013