Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Lorraine

Deceased

Bishop of Metz

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Onofrio

Administrator of Agen

Administrator of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

Administrator of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1498BornBar-le-Duc
26 Jul 15013.2AppointedBishop of Metz, France
17 Oct 151719.5AppointedAdministrator of Toul, France
28 May 151820.1Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jan 151920.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Onofrio
26 Apr 152123.0AppointedAdministrator of Valence and Die, France
7 Jan 152223.7AppointedAdministrator of Thérouanne, France
11 Jan 152324.7ResignedAdministrator of Valence and Die, France
9 Dec 152325.6AppointedAdministrator of Verdun, France
14 Dec 152325.6AppointedAdministrator of Luçon, France
11 Jan 152425.7ResignedAdministrator of Luçon, France
12 Feb 152425.8ResignedAdministrator of Toul, France
16 Nov 153234.6AppointedAdministrator of Reims, France
6 Aug 153537.3AppointedAdministrator of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
8 Nov 153537.5ResignedAdministrator of Thérouanne, France
20 Jun 153739.1AppointedAdministrator of Lyon, France
6 Feb 153839.8ResignedAdministrator of Reims, France
24 May 153840.1AppointedAdministrator of Agen, France
29 Oct 153941.5ResignedAdministrator of Lyon, France
18 Aug 154244.3AppointedAdministrator of Nantes, France
4 Jun 154446.1ResignedAdministrator of Verdun, France
10 May 155052.0DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Lorraine:
Jean Cardinal de Lorraine (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a cardinal for 31.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 May 1518

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015