Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Hébert

Deceased

Bishop of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹BornTours
1675¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 170352.9SelectedBishop of Agen, France
11 Feb 170453.1ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
6 Apr 170453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
17 Jun 170453.4InstalledBishop of Agen, France
20 Aug 172877.6DiedBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Hébert:
Bishop François Hébert (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Agen

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015