Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaston-Jean-Baptiste-Louis de Noailles

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1669BornParis
6 Mar 169424.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 169526.4SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
2 Apr 169626.7ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
20 May 169626.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
15 Sep 172051.1DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Gaston-Jean-Baptiste-Louis de Noailles:
Bishop Gaston-Jean-Baptiste-Louis de Noailles (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015