Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude-Maur d’Aubigné

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1658BornTigné
13 Apr 168627.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 170142.8SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
6 Jun 170142.9ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
24 Jul 170143.1Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
24 Dec 170749.5SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
27 Feb 170849.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
22 Apr 171960.8DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Maur d’Aubigné:
Archbishop Claude-Maur d’Aubigné (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 293, and Page 336
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015